judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4833
B-4833
08/26/1974
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS WAREHOUSE COMPANY OF DALLAS, INC.
SPRINGS MILLS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/13/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/16/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
08/26/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/20/1975Response to Motion filed
02/13/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/16/1974Response to Petition
09/06/1974Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
08/26/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Springs Mills, Inc.Respondent
Texas Warehouse Company of Dallas, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information