judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00251-CR
14-82-00251-CR
04/15/1982
Forgery
Thompson, Kenneth G.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/22/1983Case RETURNED from Higher Court
07/22/1983Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/17/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/06/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
05/05/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/20/1983Submission
09/29/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
08/31/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
08/13/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
04/15/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
345,680
5 yrs.