judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BYRON BAKER v. DONALD W. SPEAKS, KATHLEEN B. SPEAKS, DAVID SPEAKS, and ELIZABETH SPEAKS

Case Heading (S-07-0170)
Case Number:S-07-0170Case Docketed On:07/26/2007
Linked To: S-07-0195
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BYRON BAKER v. DONALD W. SPEAKS, KATHLEEN B. SPEAKS, DAVID SPEAKS, and ELIZABETH SPEAKS
Full Title:BYRON BAKER, Appellant (Defendant/Counter Plaintiff), v. DONALD W. SPEAKS, KATHLEEN B. SPEAKS, DAVID SPEAKS, and ELIZABETH SPEAKS, Appellees (Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantByron Baker Pro Se
AppelleeDonald W. SpeaksPaula Ann Fleck
John Gallinger
AppelleeKathleen B. SpeaksPaula Ann Fleck
John Gallinger
AppelleeDavid SpeaksPaula Ann Fleck
John Gallinger
AppelleeElizabeth SpeaksPaula Ann Fleck
John Gallinger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 20
Citation:177 P.3d 803

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/04/2007Response/Objection - Motion. Response to motion to dismiss. This pleading was improperly combined by docket entry below. This response is to the Motion to dismiss filed in docket number S-07-0195.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/04/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary. Request to dismiss appeal of Byron Baker. This was improperly combined with response filed above.MotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/05/2007Order - Denying request to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
09/10/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance from Paula A. Fleck on behalf of appelleesNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
10/08/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - John D. BowersMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/08/2007Order - Other. Order allowing withdrawal of counsel - John D. Bowers.OrderOtherFinal
10/23/2007Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
10/23/2007Motion - Strike portion of appellant's designation of record, certificate of service left blank inadvertently. Served same day as brief; counsel will sent corrected copyMotionStrikeFinal
10/24/2007Motion - Strike portion of appellant's designation of record (replaces previous filing) May be decided in opinion - if so, make tickler.MotionStrikeFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/02/2007Response/Objection - Motion to strike portion of appellant's designation of record.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/08/2007Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellant replyFinal
11/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2007Order - Other - Order on motion to strike portions of appellant's designation of record (order states that the motion will be determined in the opinion).OrderOtherFinal
11/16/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from clerk of district court indicating that the record may not be sent out until 11/26/07 - she will be out of the office until then.EventPhone CallFinal
11/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/11/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/17/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/13/08 by Dorothy Painter.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal