Case: A-310
A-310
08/14/1944
Application for Writ of Error
VIOLA WALL, ET AL.
NORA WALL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/09/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/16/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/15/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/08/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
01/31/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
01/05/1945 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
12/07/1944 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/29/1944 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
09/13/1944 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/14/1944 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/31/1945 | Letter Filed | | ||
03/09/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/01/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/19/1945 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
02/16/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/15/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/08/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
01/31/1945 | Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
01/31/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/05/1945 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
12/07/1944 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/29/1944 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/11/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
09/13/1944 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/14/1944 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/14/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Viola Wall, et al. | Petitioner | |
Ike D. White | Amicus Curiae | |
George E. Shelly | Amicus Curiae | |
Nora Wall, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information