Case: 09-87-00017-CV
09-87-00017-CV
01/21/1987
Probate of Will Contests
Hillman, Jr., Carl Evander
Hillman, Addlean, Administratrix
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/27/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/10/1987 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/11/1987 | ORAL ARGUMENT WAIVED | | |
06/11/1987 | Submitted | | |
06/11/1987 | Submission | | |
05/11/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
04/03/1987 | Submission | | |
03/13/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
03/13/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/19/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
01/21/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
01/21/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/27/1987 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Jefferson
Honorable Alfred S Gerson
51232