judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00331-CR
14-82-00331-CR
04/15/1982
Robbery
Brown, Kenneth James
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1983Mandate Issued
09/29/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/07/1983Submission
06/13/1983Case ready to be set
04/20/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
03/25/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
03/10/1983Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/03/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/09/1983No description available.
11/10/1982No description available.GRANTED
11/01/1982No description available.
04/15/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable VAN C. STOVALL
338,338
60 yrs.