judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00259-CR
01-82-00259-CR
04/15/1982
Theft
McElyea, Robert Michael
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/21/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
11/02/1984No description available.
10/18/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/18/1984Opinion issuedAbate case
10/05/1984Brief due for retained counsel
10/04/1984Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
01/24/1984Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/27/1983Submission
02/10/1983Order entered
07/19/1982Record filed
04/07/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable M. A. LOVE
264,227
3 years