judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STANDARD ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY v. WILL G. KNOX, RECEIVER OF UNITED EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY

Case: A-309
A-309
08/14/1944
Application for Writ of Error
STANDARD ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
WILL G. KNOX, RECEIVER OF UNITED EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/15/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/21/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/01/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/21/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/20/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
08/30/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/14/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/15/1945Brief in Support of Petition
12/30/1944Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
12/21/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/01/1944Response to Brief filed
11/21/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
09/20/1944Reply to Response
09/13/1944Response to Petition
08/30/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/14/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/14/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Will G. Knox, Receiver of United Employers Casualty CompanyRespondent
Standard Accident Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Cole, Patterson, Cole and McDaniel, and Leif K. FrickstadAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information