judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHEGA, INC. V. HARRY KIMANI, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1089
Short Caption:SHEGA, INC. V. HARRY KIMANI, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5229-09Filed Date:08/26/2010

Opening Event Date:08/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShega Inc.N
Samuel BaileyNY
AppelleeHarry Kimani N
Michael D. Mcgill NN
AppelleeFrederick Williams N
Michael D. Mcgill NN
AppelleeRudolph Williams N
Michael D. Mcgill NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/08/2010TMC - NOA - motion to stay
10/12/2010 ORDERED that APPEAL NO 10CV1011 IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of standing. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant GOINS'S MOTIONS for EXTENSION OF TIME and FOR STAY filed in appeal NO 10CV1011 ARE DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHEGA INC.'S MOTION TO JOIN THE MOTION FOR STAY FILED IN APPEAL NO. 10CV1011 IS GRANTED and the MOTION shall be DEEMED FILED IN APPEAL NO. 10CV1089. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that SHEGA INC.'S MOTION TO STAY FILED IN APPEAL NO 10CV1089 IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPEAL NO. 10CV1089 IS TAKEN FROM THE JULY 8, 2010 ORDER that directed SHEGA to take certain action and the JULY 23, 2010 ORDER TO THE EXTENT that it denied a motion to alter or amend the JULY 8, 2010 ORDER. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (RZGLNB) (rm)
11/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/21/10, 7/8/10, 8/19/10, 9/2/10, 9/16/10, 9/16/10 & 9/24/10) (elp)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (41-pgs/hill 6/21/10 proc.)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (23-pgs/swaringer 7/8/10 proc.)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (25-pgs/johnson 8/19/10 proc.)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (25-pgs/tape 9/2/10 proc.)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (32-pgs/tape 9/16/10 proc.)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (29-pgs/tape 9/24/10 proc.)w/cd
02/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
04/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 25, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
05/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 11, 2011, directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDEREd that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
05/11/2011DISMISSED
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED