judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOYD (TERREL) VS. WARDEN C/W 34823

Case Information: 34822
Short Caption:LOYD (TERREL) VS. WARDEN C/W 34823Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34822*, 34823
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P2817Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08642
09/17/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion & Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. 99-08791
09/27/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation is approved and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. A joint fast track statement shall be filed and served within 20 days of this order. Nos. 34822, 34823. 99-09406
10/08/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (nos. 34822 & 34823). 99-09744
10/08/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. (nos. 34822 & 34823). 99-09745
10/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (Nos. 34822 and 34823). 99-10166
05/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We have reviewed the record on appeal and for the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly denied appellant's petitions. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 34822, 34823. 00-07447
06/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09377
06/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 15, 2000. 00-09377