Case: 13-15-00044-CR
13-15-00044-CR
01/27/2015
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
The State of Texas
Joyce Popp Hajovsky
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/23/2015 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
04/09/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
02/26/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
02/26/2015 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/26/2015 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||||||
02/12/2015 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||||
02/12/2015 | Internal memo | | |||||||
01/30/2015 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
01/29/2015 | Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal | | |||||||
01/27/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
01/22/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/16/2015 | Order entered | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/09/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
04/09/2040 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Ross M. Kurtz |
Hajovsky, Joyce Popp | Appellee | Hon. Richard L. Manske |
Trial Court Information
County Court
Wharton
Honorable Phillip Spenrath
61643