judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00240-CV
01-82-00240-CV
04/16/1982
Injunction
Felts, David J.
8920 Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/14/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/14/1983No description available.
01/20/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/10/1983Motion for rehearing filed
12/30/1982Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
09/23/1982Submitted
06/17/1982Brief filed
05/25/1982Brief filed
05/13/1982Statement of facts filed
04/16/1982Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
82-6860