Case: WR-90,204-03
WR-90,204-03
08/02/2019
11.07 HC
MOSELEY, JEANA DENISE A/K/A JEANA DENISE PLACE A/K/A JEANNA DENISE PLACE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/2020 | MOT FOR RECON DISP | Dismissed |
| ||||
07/14/2020 | MOT FOR RECON RECD | | |||||
02/27/2020 | MOT FOR RECON DISP | Dismissed |
| ||||
02/11/2020 | MOT FOR RECON RECD |
| |||||
01/15/2020 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. |
| ||||
01/02/2020 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
12/19/2019 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
08/21/2019 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
08/16/2019 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
08/08/2019 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
08/02/2019 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/15/2020 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MOSELEY, JEANA DENISE | Applicant | Thomas Abbate Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court
Parker
CR14-0594-01