judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00129-CR
04-82-00129-CR
04/15/1982
All Misdemeanors
Gordon, IV, Harry Brace
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
05/19/1982Brief Filed
05/19/1982Case ready to be set
05/10/1982Brief Filed
05/10/1982No Description Available.
04/15/1982No Description Available.
03/12/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
03/12/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Gillespie
Honorable J. T. Brite
2841
$150 & 3 days/pro 9 months