judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-82-00077-CR
12-82-00077-CR
04/15/1982
Assault & battery
Peacock, Jerry Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1985Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/07/1985Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Denied
10/25/1985No Description Available.
06/04/1985
05/28/1985Mandate Issued
05/11/1985
04/11/1985Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/15/1985motion for rehearing filed
02/28/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/19/1984Submitted
04/04/1984Brief Filed
03/19/1984
03/08/1984Motion for Leave to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/1984Response to Motion Filed
02/29/1984Motion for Leave to File
08/18/1983Motion or Writ Denied
08/18/1983No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1983No Description Available.
08/15/1983
01/21/1983Brief Filed
12/30/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/24/1982Brief Filed
11/09/1982Record Filed
10/28/1982
06/17/1982Mot ext time file record dispMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/1982
06/10/1982affidavit filed
04/15/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
123rd District Court
Shelby
Honorable Donald R. Ross
11,684
Life