Case: 15-0017
15-0017
01/12/2015
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
JOSE ALVARADO AND ISABEL ALVARADO
WAI WAI L.L.C. AND 1717 INVESTMENTS, L.L.C.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/19/2015 | Case Stored | | | |||
02/09/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing is dismissed because no filing fee was paid | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioners Jose Alvarado and Isabel Alvarado dismissed for failure to pay filing fee. |
| ||
01/27/2015 | Notice requesting filing fee | Fee request for Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review sent to Isabel Alvarado. |
| |||
01/21/2015 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Called Ms. Alvarado and left a message indicating that motion will be dismissed if a corrected one was not resubmitted. Requested that Ms. Alvarado contact us. | | |||
01/16/2015 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Called Ms. Alvarado regarding the refiling of her corrected Motion for Extension of Time. Received no answer, left a message. | | |||
01/12/2015 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Ms. Alvarado regarding current contact information and corrections for previously filed motion. Ms. Alvarado indicated she plans to resubmit within a few days. | | |||
01/12/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | DOCUMENT STRUCK | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioners Jose Alvarado and Isabel Alvarado. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/20/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
1717 Investments, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Michael Burns |
Wai Wai, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Michael Burns |
Alvarado, Isabel | Petitioner | Ms. Isabel Alvarado |
Alvarado, Jose | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-13-00540-CV
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt
___ SW3d ___, 11-26-14
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Scott K. Field
Trial Court Information
368th District Court
Williamson
Honorable Alfred Burton (Burt) Carnes
12-1086-C368