Case: 10-86-00233-CV
10-86-00233-CV
12/30/1986
Divorce
Linda Gray Burton
Donald Ross Burton
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
09/01/1987 | Case stored | | |
09/01/1987 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
07/16/1987 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/04/1987 | Submitted | | |
12/30/1986 | Notice of Appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/02/2002 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
18th District Court
Johnson
563384-A