judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00326-CR
01-82-00326-CR
04/27/1982
Burglary
Smith, Dennis Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/31/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/14/1983Submitted
05/25/1983Submission
05/19/1983Submission
02/22/1983Brief filed
01/27/1983Brief filed
01/27/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/20/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/29/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/16/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/27/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/31/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
348,529
life