judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PODESTA VS. GUTSTEIN

Case Information: 34818
Short Caption:PODESTA VS. GUTSTEINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34784 , 42534 , 54815
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D183564Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08598
09/13/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. (Attorney Rhonda L. Mushkin).
09/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
01/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/DA 00-00242
02/02/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01771
02/02/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2000. 00-01771