judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LINDA KUNSELMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0167)
Case Number:S-07-0167Case Docketed On:07/23/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:LINDA KUNSELMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LINDA KUNSELMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLinda KunselmanDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2008 WY 85
Citation:188 P.3d 567

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/23/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/07/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/10/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/24/2007Brief - Anders; received copy of brief on diskBriefAndersFinal
10/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief AppellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/24/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/24/2007Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
11/06/2007Order - Denying withdrawal of counsel and requiring the public defender to file brief addressing the merits.OrderDenying withdrawal of counselFinal
11/06/2007Record - Returned unfiled record to public defender.RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
12/21/2007Brief - Appellant (ordered by court after denial of Anders and withdrawal); and received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
02/04/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and received designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/21/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/06/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/06/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/18/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal