judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00190-CR
04-82-00190-CR
04/27/1982
Arson
Rodriguez, Manuel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
02/18/1983Brief Filed
02/18/1983Case ready to be set
01/21/1983Brief Filed
12/21/1982Record Approved
12/15/1982Record Filed
12/14/1982No Description Available.
10/28/1982No Description Available.
08/24/1982No Description Available.
07/20/1982Motion f/l/file Notice of Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/16/1982Motion f/l/file Notice of Appeal Filed
07/14/1982No Description Available.
06/17/1982Motion to Substitute Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/09/1982Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed
04/26/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
04/26/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable H Frank Garcia
81-CR-1705
Ten years