Case: 07-86-00308-CV
07-86-00308-CV
12/22/1986
Miscellaneous civil
Pollard; Elza, Kathy Pollard and Mike Justice
First National Bank in Dalhart
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/26/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/26/1987 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
03/26/1987 | Submitted | | |
03/26/1987 | Submission | | |
03/20/1987 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
02/28/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/20/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
12/22/1986 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
12/22/1986 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/1987 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
69th District Court
Dallam
Honorable Jack R. Miller
7780