judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00194-CV
04-82-00194-CV
04/27/1982
Divorce
McGarity, Joicelyn Yvette
McGarity, Sidney
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/28/1983Mandate Issued
02/28/1983Mandate Issued
01/28/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/12/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
01/12/1983Appeal DismissedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
01/12/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
05/24/1982Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/27/1982No Description Available.
04/27/1982Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
04/27/1982Appeal Bond Filed
04/27/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/05/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
81-CI-8529