judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00284-CR
01-82-00284-CR
04/26/1982
Other Felony
Hall, Robert J.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/09/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
08/03/1984No description available.Refused
03/09/1984No description available.
02/09/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1984Submitted
12/30/1983Submission
11/30/1983Brief filed
12/10/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
11/30/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/10/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/01/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/04/1982Brief filed
09/02/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/26/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/12/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/26/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/08/1982Record filed
04/26/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Galveston
55,700
1 yr. & 2,000 Fine