Case: 13-86-00571-CR
13-86-00571-CR
12/19/1986
Other Drug Possession
Newlin, Robert Herman
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/19/1987 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/15/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/09/1987 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
08/14/1987 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
07/29/1987 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
07/29/1987 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/29/1987 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Dismissed as Moot | |
07/16/1987 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
06/25/1987 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
06/25/1987 | Submitted | | |
06/25/1987 | Submission | | |
06/16/1987 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
06/16/1987 | Submission | | |
06/04/1987 | Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/02/1987 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
06/02/1987 | Statement of Facts Received | | |
05/22/1987 | Motion for leave to file brief | | |
05/22/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/22/1987 | Appellant's Brief Received | | |
05/22/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
04/15/1987 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
04/15/1987 | Statement of Facts Received | | |
04/10/1987 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
04/02/1987 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/16/1987 | Affidavit Filed | | |
03/02/1987 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
02/25/1987 | Affidavit Filed | | |
02/12/1987 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
02/02/1987 | Green card in | | |
01/28/1987 | 10 day letter sent | | |
01/24/1987 | Due date for record to be filed | | |
01/14/1987 | Transcript Filed | | |
01/14/1987 | Transcript Received | | |
12/19/1986 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/15/1987 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
329th District Court
Wharton
Honorable Daniel R Sklar
9563
15 years TDC