judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00285-CV
01-82-00285-CV
04/27/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jordan, Price dba J. J.'s Auto Sales et al
William B. Bates and Judy Maxwell
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/09/1983No description available.
06/23/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/03/1983Motion for rehearing filed
05/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/12/1983Supplemental brief filed
03/30/1983Submitted
02/24/1983Submission
12/09/1982Brief filed
12/09/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/17/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
11/15/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/29/1982Brief filed
09/30/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/22/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/16/1982Statement of facts filed
04/27/1982Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/09/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
32,700-A