judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-1218
C-1218
04/28/1982
WRIT ERROR - CAUSE
WILBUR L. GINTHER ET AL.
HENRY J. N. TAUB
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/12/1984Additional citations received.PetitionerPET'S ADDITIONAL AUTHORITIES
10/02/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, BLAKE TARTT, 800 BANK OF THE SOUTHWEST, HOUSTON, TX. 77002
09/19/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)FOR FEDERAL TITLE CO., MR. STEVEN E. HALPIN, 5151 SAN FELIPE, SUITE 860, HOUSTON, TX. 77056
09/19/1984Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPET'S REPLY OF AMC BR WHEAT (EVT 21)
09/18/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)AMC BR OF SAM B. COBB
09/07/1984Brief on the MeritsRespondentRESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REHEARING
09/06/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)AMC BR OF LEE COUNTY LAND AND AB- STRACT COMPANY
09/05/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)AMC BR OF JOHN V. WHEAT OF WHEAT, THORNTON & BURNETT, 3401 LOUISIANA ST, HOUSTON 77002
08/24/1984Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/26/1984Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/05/1982Letter brief PetitionerSUMMARY OF ARGUMENT FOR PETITIONERS
06/24/1982Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/28/1982Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPPENDICES TO APP FILE (SEPARATE VOL
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/18/1993Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedEMER MO TO SIGN OUT ORIG RECORDS/BEHALF TRANSAM. NAT.GAS CORP. -TO CC & RETURN
02/16/1993Miscellaneous MotionEmergency motion to sign out original records; behalf of TransAmerican Natural Gas Corporation, f/k/a GHR Energy Corp. . (TANG), and TransAmerican Gas Trans.
12/21/1984Petitioner's reply briefPET'S REPLY TO RESP'S REBUTTAL
12/15/1984Respondent's reply to petitioner's brief'RESPONDENT'S REBUTTAL TO PET'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S REPLY TO SUMMARY OF ARGUMENT'
11/10/1984Cause SubmittedARGUED FOR PETITIONERS BY THOMAS M. PHILLIPS. ARGUED FOR RESPONDENT BY W. ROBERT BROWN.
10/12/1984Additional citations received.PET'S ADDITIONAL AUTHORITIES
10/04/1984Mandate issued
10/03/1984Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
10/02/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedFULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, BLAKE TARTT, 800 BANK OF THE SOUTHWEST, HOUSTON, TX. 77002
09/19/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedFOR FEDERAL TITLE CO., MR. STEVEN E. HALPIN, 5151 SAN FELIPE, SUITE 860, HOUSTON, TX. 77056
09/19/1984Brief on the MeritsPET'S REPLY OF AMC BR WHEAT (EVT 21)
09/18/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAMC BR OF SAM B. COBB
09/07/1984Brief on the MeritsRESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REHEARING
09/06/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAMC BR OF LEE COUNTY LAND AND AB- STRACT COMPANY
09/05/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAMC BR OF JOHN V. WHEAT OF WHEAT, THORNTON & BURNETT, 3401 LOUISIANA ST, HOUSTON 77002
08/24/1984Reply to Response
08/14/1984Motion for Rehearing forwarded
07/26/1984Motion for Rehearing
07/11/1984Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed
01/17/1984Suggestion of Death
12/06/1982Petitioner's reply briefPET'S REPLY TO RESP'S REPLY TO EVT 9
11/22/1982Respondent's reply to petitioner's briefREPLY TO SUMMARY OF ARGUMENT FOR PET
11/05/1982Letter brief SUMMARY OF ARGUMENT FOR PETITIONERS
07/21/1982Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGRANTED ON POINTS 1 & 3
07/20/1982Respondent's reply to petitioner's brief
07/02/1982Petitioner's reply brief
06/24/1982Reply to Response
06/02/1982Case forwarded to Court3 FOLDERS & 1 BOX SENT UP
04/30/1982motion for extension of time to file reply grantedFiling grantedM/E/T TO REPLY GRANTED FOR 6 WEEKS
04/28/1982Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPPENDICES TO APP FILE (SEPARATE VOL
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/04/1984Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F/K/A GHR ENERGY CORP. (TANG)Other interested party Mr. Matthew Hoffman
TRANSAMERICAN NATURAL GAS CORPOther interested party Mr. Matthew Hoffman
TRANSAMERICAN GAS TRANSMISSIONOther interested party Ms. Phyllis G. Schrader
F/K/A GHR TRANSMISSION CORP.Other interested party Ms. Phyllis G. Schrader
Court of Appeals Information:
631 SW2d 775
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
111th District Court
Webb
Honorable E. D. Salinas
28,893