judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00533-CR
05-82-00533-CR
04/28/1982
Burglary
Flemming, Cleveland
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2018Order enteredDestroy
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
03/06/1985Mandate IssuedAffirmed
02/15/1985Opinion issuedDismissed
08/15/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/14/1983Submitted
05/04/1983Submission
11/22/1982Brief Filed
10/21/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/20/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/23/1982Brief Filed
07/27/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
06/14/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/28/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
f81-33289-lj
15 yrs, TDC