judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00490-CR
04-81-00490-CR
04/26/1982
Marijuana Possession
Medina, Victor
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/11/1984Mandate Issued
06/11/1984Mandate Issued
06/04/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
02/07/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/03/1984Petition for Review Filed
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/26/1983Submission
07/26/1983Submitted
05/26/1982Case ready to be set
05/26/1982Brief Filed
05/26/1982Case ready to be set
05/18/1982Brief Filed
04/19/1982Record Approved
03/23/1982Record Filed
03/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/1982Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
12/28/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
12/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
63rd Judicial District Court
Val Verde
Honorable George Thurmond
4656
Four years & 5,000 fine