Case Information: 89-BG-0056 | |||
Short Caption: | RICHARD LIVINGSTON AKEL V. DCCA COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 01/25/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/25/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Richard Livingston Akel | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | Dcca Committee on Admissions | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | AKEL, RICHARD LIVINGSTON DCCA COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 6/28/89 ORDER THAT THIS COURTS NOTE - 01 6/26/89 ORD IS AMENDED TO NOTE - 02 REFLECT THAT JUDGE TERRY WOULD NOTE - 02 VOTE TO GRANT THE PETITION FOR NOTE - 03 WAIVER ON THE GROUND OF NOTE - 03 PERSONAL HARDSHIP. NOTE - 04 6/30/89 ORD: 6/26/89 ORDER NOTE - 04 AMENDED TO REFLECT THAT JUDGE NOTE - 05 TERRY WOULD VOTE TO GRANT THE NOTE - 05 PET FOR WAIVER ON THE GROUND NOTE - 06 OF PERSONAL HARDSHIP; 6/28/89 NOTE - 06 ORDER VACATED. | |||
01/25/1989 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/25/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/06/1989 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & LLOYD N. MOORE, JR.,ESQ. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/14/1989 | ORDER REFER PET TO COA FOR RECOMMEN- DATION. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD M | |||
05/08/1989 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF COMM. ON ADMISSIONS (COM RECOMMENDS DENIAL). PB PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CAR | |||
05/08/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL PETITION FOR REVIEW. PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/26/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
06/26/1989 | ORDER DENY PETITION AND FO THAT THE MOTION TO EXPEDITE IS DENIED AS MOOT. PB PANELBETEST SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD VS | |||
06/26/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - D METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
06/28/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-3 PB PANELBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |