judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID K. STONE and NICHOLAS B. LOUNDAGIN v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., and CARPENTER & SONS, INC.

Case Heading (S-07-0166)
Case Number:S-07-0166Case Docketed On:07/23/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Lands (Title 36)
Short Title:DAVID K. STONE and NICHOLAS B. LOUNDAGIN v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., and CARPENTER & SONS, INC.
Full Title:DAVID K. STONE and NICHOLAS B. LOUNDAGIN, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., and CARPENTER & SONS, INC., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid K. StoneStephen R. Winship
AppellantNicholas B. LoundaginStephen R. Winship
AppelleeDevon Energy Production Company, L.P.Scott P. Klosterman
AppelleeCarpenter & Sons, Inc.Scott P. Klosterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Natural Resources - Oil and Gas, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 49
Citation:181 P.3d 936 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/23/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/23/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/10/2007Brief - Appellants'; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/25/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record and copy of brief on cdNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/09/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Winship for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Klosterman for appelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/28/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stephen R. Winship for appellants; Scott P. Klosterman for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanded for consideration of remaining claims.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/07/2008Petition - Rehearing and brief in support of petitionPetitionRehearingFinal
05/20/2008Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/20/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/21/08 by Mina Stewart.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal