judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Hieu Anthony Tran v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-17-00245-CR
05-17-00245-CR
03/07/2017
Aggravated Assault
Hieu Anthony Tran
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
08/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
06/30/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
05/02/2018Mandate issued
04/24/2018Case returned from higher court
03/28/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
02/26/2018Case forwarded to higher court
02/21/2018Petition for discretionary review filed
01/19/2018Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/08/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
01/03/2018Motion for rehearing filed
12/20/2017Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
12/20/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
11/14/2017Submitted
09/29/2017Set for submission on oral argument
09/25/2017Letter received
08/29/2017State brief due
08/11/2017Case ready to be set
08/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/30/2017State brief due
07/28/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
07/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/06/2017Appellants brief due
07/03/2017Appearance of counsel
06/30/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/09/2017Appellants brief due
06/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/25/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
05/22/2017Response due
05/17/2017Trial court certification filed
05/12/2017Letter issued by the court
05/12/2017Letter issued by the court
05/11/2017Exhibits filed
05/10/2017Exhibits filed
05/10/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
05/09/2017Letter received
05/01/2017Response disposed
04/21/2017Letter issued by the court
04/18/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed
04/06/2017No clerks record filed in criminal case
04/05/2017No reporters record filed in criminal case
04/04/2017Record due
03/17/2017Docketing statement filed
03/07/2017Docketing statement due
03/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/02/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court
02/03/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/2017Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tran, Hieu AnthonyCriminal - AppellantBruce Anton  
Hieu Anthony Tran
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasFaith Johnson  
M. Paige Williams
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Dominique Collins
F-1530244-K
Charon Evans
80 years institutional division, TDCJ