judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-82-00115-CV
07-82-00115-CV
04/28/1982
Contract
Ligon, Walter
Waldrop, Cecil, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/17/1984Mandate Issued
05/31/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1983Submitted
08/15/1983Submission
11/10/1982Case ready to be set
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/17/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
181st District Court
Potter
Honorable David L. Gleason
60,394-B