judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00528-CR
05-82-00528-CR
04/28/1982
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
Steve Edawrd Norris
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/24/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/23/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/21/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
07/11/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/23/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/23/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/30/1982Letter issued by the court
05/03/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/28/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/23/1982Clerks record filed
03/23/1982Reporters record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/11/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Norris, Steve EdwardCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 4
F81-8890-IMK
Life