Case: 05-82-00535-CR
05-82-00535-CR
04/28/1982
Aggravated Assault
Joe Hernandez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/23/1983 | Supplemental brief filed | Pro Se | |
03/28/1983 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
01/24/1983 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/29/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
12/28/1983 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
08/30/1983 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |
08/24/1983 | Letter issued by the court | | |
08/22/1983 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |
07/05/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/23/1983 | Supplemental brief filed | | |
06/23/1983 | Letter received | | |
03/28/1983 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
02/23/1983 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/24/1983 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |
12/20/1982 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/18/1982 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/26/1982 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/27/1982 | Clerks record filed | | |
07/27/1982 | Reporters record filed | | |
06/09/1982 | Motion for extension of time to file record filed | | |
04/28/1982 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/05/1983 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Hernandez, Joe | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 203rd District Court
F82-75741-LQ
Life TDC