judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00545-CR
05-82-00545-CR
04/29/1982
Attempted Murder
David Lee Rhone
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/2017Order enteredDestroy
04/12/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
12/14/1984Mandate Issued
12/07/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
03/06/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/01/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/08/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
12/27/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1983Submitted
09/21/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
08/30/1983MattConv
08/11/1983Brief Filed
06/13/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/13/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/23/1983Brief Filed
04/19/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/18/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/22/1983Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
01/21/1983Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/04/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/1982Order Record Disposed
09/22/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 4
F81-5304-RJKJK
10 yrs TDC