judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00287-CR
14-82-00287-CR
04/28/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Goff, Jackie
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/05/1986Mandate Issued
11/19/1986Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/25/1984Submission
12/12/1983Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/20/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
07/14/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/24/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/02/1983Submission
06/02/1983Submission
06/02/1983Submitted
05/02/1983Case ready to be set
03/11/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
03/11/1983No description available.
03/11/1983Case ready to be set
01/20/1983No description available.
12/30/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/23/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/10/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/19/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
04/28/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
04/28/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTravis B. Bryan, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. William W. Vance
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable JAMES BRADLEY SMITH
13,514
90 yrs.