judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00290-CR
01-82-00290-CR
04/28/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Burnett, Mark
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/30/1983No description available.Grant motion
06/21/1983No description available.
06/02/1983Motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
06/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/25/1983Motion for rehearing filed
04/14/1983Opinion issuedDismissed for want of jurisdiction
03/24/1983Submitted
03/22/1983Supplemental brief filed
02/17/1983Brief filed
02/17/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/17/1983Submission
02/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/13/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/06/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/01/1982Brief filed
08/17/1982Record filed
04/28/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
347,306
life