judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00560-CR
05-82-00560-CR
05/03/1982
Murder
Thomas Earl Jackson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/11/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/10/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/12/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
08/12/1983Motion for rehearing disposed
08/08/1983Motion for rehearing filed
07/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/07/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/10/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/23/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/28/1982Reporters record filed
10/28/1982Clerks record filed
08/30/1982Letter received
08/30/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
07/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
05/03/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/22/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Jackson, Thomas EarlCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 265th District Court
F81-30593-IR
25 years TDC