judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00329-CR
01-82-00329-CR
05/03/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Colson, Willie Edward
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/10/1983Submitted
06/30/1983Submission
04/11/1983Brief filed
03/28/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/25/1983Brief filed
02/03/1983Order entered
10/28/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/21/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/08/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/29/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/03/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
324,067
20 years