judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF HOVANEC

Case Information: 34814
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF HOVANECCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G19883Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/03/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08580
09/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from U.S. Petroleum Enterprises-check no. 1146.
11/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10758
12/03/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 12/01/99. 99-12104
12/03/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person document received from appellant. We conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04124
04/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2. 00-05758
04/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2000. 00-05758