Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
08/18/2010 | | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
08/25/2010 | | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 18, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this roder, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp | |
09/28/2010 | | Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, this court's order of August 25, 2010, which directed appellant to file the statement regarding transcripts in appeal no. 10-CV-1021, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-1021 and 10-CV-1039 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, for both appeals, appellants shall within 20 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be presented with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants failure to response to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp | |
10/18/2010 | | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/28/10, 7/30/10, 3/10/10, 3/31/10 & 1/15/10) (elp) | |
12/02/2010 | | On consideration of the Statement Regarding Transcript filed with this court on October 18, 2010, and it appearing that all required transcripts have not yet been ordered, it is ORDERED that appellants shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the status of the transcripts. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp | |
12/16/2010 | | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- re: transcripts *Appellant indicated that she has been informed by CRD to pick up transcripts. (elp) | |
12/21/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (21-pgs/tape 1/15/10 proc.) | |
12/21/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (95-pgs/tape 3/31/10 proc.) | |
12/21/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (8-pgs/tape 5/28/10 proc.) | |
12/21/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (23-pgs/tape 7/23/10 proc.)w/cd | |
12/29/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (10-CV-1039) | |
01/05/2011 | | RECORD INDEX (10-CV-1021) | |
01/05/2011 | | RECORD COMPLETED (10-CV-1021) | |
01/05/2011 | | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp ***VACATED/SEE 5/25/11 ORDER BELOW | |
02/17/2011 | | On consideration of this court's order of January 5, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp | |
02/18/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY | |
03/02/2011 | | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to stay | |
03/16/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY | |
03/16/2011 | | RECEIVED_- aplt's to aple oppo to the motion to stay the appeal pending joinder of the final judgment of the superior in this matter | |
04/04/2011 | | On consideration of appellants' motion to stay pending the addition of the the appeal of a final judgment, the opposition thereto, and appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged reply to appellee's opposition, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file appellants lodged reply. It is (MORE) | |
04/04/2011 | | APPELLANT'S REPLY to appellee's opposition | |
04/04/2011 | | FURTHER ORDERED that appellants shall file the new notice of appeal within 20 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' motion to stay is hereby held in abeyance. (ETW) elp | |
05/25/2011 | | On consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that a briefing order has been issued in appeals nos. 10-CV-1021 and 10-CV-1039, and it further appearing that transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-529, and on further consideration of this court's order of April 4, 2011, which held appellant's motion to stay appeal in abeyance, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CV-529 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1021 and 10-CV-1039 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE) | |
05/25/2011 | | FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' motion to stay is denied as moot. It is (MORE) | |
05/25/2011 | | FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing order issued on January 5, 2011, is hereby vacated and a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in appeal no. 11-CV-529 as required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp | |
08/10/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #5 (29 pgs/Tape) (8/24/07 proc.) | |
08/10/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #6 (21 pgs/Tape) (11/16/07 proc.) | |
08/10/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #7 (34 pgs. -- Tape) (1/30/09 proc.) | |
09/20/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals and Directing a Consolidated briefing order upon the filing in this court by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index in appeals nos 11-CV-529 and 11-CV-111 and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3(A). | |
10/03/2011 | Filed | Record Index 11-cv-529 & 11-cv 1111 | |
10/03/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #8 (4-pgs/tape 1/14/11 proc.)w/cd | |
11/09/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record#9 (69-pgs/tape 4/25/08 proc.) | |
11/09/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record#10 (15-pgs/tape 3/7/08 proc.) | |
11/09/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #11 (23-pgs/tape 7/13/07 proc.) | |
11/15/2011 | Filed | Briefing Order | |
12/30/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 60 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
01/10/2012 | Filed | Opposition to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee) | |
01/17/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 60 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | |
02/27/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
03/19/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | |
04/17/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
04/25/2012 | Filed | Opposition to appellants motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee) | |
05/07/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | |
05/07/2012 | Struck | Brief (Appellant) | |
05/07/2012 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) vol. I thru IV | |
05/14/2012 | Filed | Motion To Strike brief for appellant and joint appendix (Appellee) | Granted |
05/17/2012 | Filed | Opposition to appellee's motion to strike appellant's brief and joint appendices (Appellant) | |
05/18/2012 | Filed | TMC//MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLNANT'S BRIEF & APPDX//OPPO | |
06/20/2012 | Filed | ORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION and APPELLANTS' BRIEF IS HEREBY STRUCK and APPELLANTS SHALL FILE A CONFORMING BRIEF W/N 20 DAYS | |
07/10/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | |
07/10/2012 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | |
07/11/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record #12 (9-pgs/tape 12/19/08 proc.) w/cd | |
08/14/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted |
08/17/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | |
09/13/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | |
10/04/2012 | Filed | Motion for leave to file decision and order of the rental housing commission as a supplement to the brief for appellee or, in the alternative, as a supplemenetal appendix (Appellee) | Denied |
10/15/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File (3 weeks) Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
10/16/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | |
10/16/2012 | Filed | Order Denying Motion for leave to file decision and order of the rental housing commission as a supplement to the brief for appellee or, in the alternative, as a supplemenetal appendix (Appellee) | |
10/16/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Consolidate 12-AA-1656 with previously consolidated appeals. nos. 10-CV-1021, 10-CV-1039, 11-CV-529 and 11-CV-1111 | |
10/16/2012 | Filed | Order in petition no. 12-AA-1656 directing the administrative agency to file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of the order | |
10/16/2012 | Filed | Initial Order 12-AA-1656 | |
10/26/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (3 weeks) Reply Brief (Appellant)
*COMBINED REPLY BRIEF AND INITIAL BRIEF DUE AFTER ISSUANCE OF BRIEFING ORDER IN 12-AA-1656 | |
11/08/2012 | Filed | Record On Appeal (12-AA-1656) | |
12/06/2012 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) | Granted |
12/12/2012 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File for leave to intervene as a party Other (Intervenor) | Granted |
12/16/2012 | Filed | Opposition to Mario Sergetti's Motion to Intervene (Petitioner) | |
01/15/2013 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File for leave to intervene as a party Other (Intervenor) | |
01/15/2013 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) | |
02/20/2013 | Filed | Letter From OAH requesting additional time to certify the transcript per the Court's order dated 1/15/13 | |
03/01/2013 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte granting the Office of Administrative Hearings request for an additional 30 days to certify the transcripts | |
04/17/2013 | Filed | Letter From re: transcript (Respondent Office of Administrative Hearings) | |
05/02/2013 | Filed | Supplemental Record | |
05/02/2013 | Filed | Record Completed - 12-AA-1656 | |
05/15/2013 | Filed | Order directing appellants/petitioner's combined reply brief in appeal no. 10-CV-1021, 10-CV-1039, 11-CV-529, & 11-CV-1111 within 40 days from the date of this order | |
05/15/2013 | Filed | Briefing Order in petitiion for review no. 12-AA-1656 | |
06/25/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief (Appellant) | Granted |
07/10/2013 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief (Appellant) | |
09/09/2013 | Filed | Brief (12-AA-1656) (Appellant) | |
09/09/2013 | Filed | Appendix (Petitioner) | |
09/09/2013 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | |
10/09/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | Granted |
10/09/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor) | Granted |
10/16/2013 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | |
10/16/2013 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor) | |
12/09/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | Granted |
12/09/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor) | Granted |
12/13/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | Granted |
12/23/2013 | Filed | Opposition to motion for an extension of time to file briefs. (Petitioner) | |
01/13/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion and Corrected Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | |
01/13/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor) | |
01/23/2014 | Filed | Brief (Intervenor) | |
01/23/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | Granted |
02/06/2014 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant) | Granted |
02/12/2014 | Filed | Joint Appendix (Appellant) | |
02/12/2014 | Filed | Reply Brief (12-AA-1656) (Petitioner) | |
02/18/2014 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant) | |
02/18/2014 | Filed | Opposition- to Rental Housing Commission's motion for an extension of time to file its brief (Appellant) | |
02/18/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | |
02/24/2014 | Filed | Memorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (RHC) | |
02/24/2014 | Filed | Briefing Completed | |
04/03/2014 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | |
04/03/2014 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | |
04/09/2014 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Corsetti) (Appellant) | |
04/09/2014 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Segreti) (Appellee) | |
05/01/2014 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | |
06/04/2014 | Filed | Argued before Associate Judge Fisher, Associate Judge Easterly, and Senior Judge Ruiz. (Lois R. Goodman, Esq. for appellant) (Michael B. Mcgovern, Esq. for appellee) | |
09/23/2014 | Filed | Affirmed In Part/Reversed & Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Ruiz, Senior Judge) | |
09/30/2014 | Filed | Affirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (AMENDED) (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Ruiz, Senior Judge) | |
10/22/2014 | Filed | Mandate | |
11/07/2014 | Filed | Motion To Publish (Amicus Curiae) | Denied |
11/10/2014 | Filed | Opposition to DC Office of Administrative Hearing's motion for extension of time and motion for publicity on memorandum opinion and judgment (Appellant) | |
12/10/2014 | Filed | Order Denying motion to publish. | |