judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

NATIONAL LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. v. ISUAR (ISAAC) RAMIREZ

Case: A-319
A-319
08/28/1944
Application for Writ of Error
NATIONAL LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
ISUAR (ISAAC) RAMIREZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/26/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/12/1944Response to Reply filedRespondent
09/11/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/31/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/26/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/12/1944Response to Reply filed
09/11/1944Reply to Response
08/31/1944Response to Motion filed
08/31/1944Response to Petition
08/29/1944Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
08/28/1944Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/28/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
National Life and Accident Insurance Company, Inc.Petitioner
Isuar (Isaac) RamirezRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information