judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00293-CV
04-82-00293-CV
05/05/1982
Divorce
Barton, Bryan W.
Barton, Joy Lenore
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/20/1983Mandate Issued
01/20/1983Mandate Issued
08/13/1982Motion for Dismissal Disposed
08/13/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/05/1982No Description Available.
07/23/1982Brief Filed
06/27/1982No Description Available.
06/24/1982No Description Available.
06/24/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/05/1982Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
80-CI-1019