Case: 04-87-00002-CR
04-87-00002-CR
01/05/1987
All Misdemeanors
Kristinik, Elgin Ray
Texas, The State Of
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/11/1988 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
03/10/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/10/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/23/1988 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
01/20/1988 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/20/1988 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/08/1987 | Submitted | | |
09/08/1987 | Submission | | |
09/08/1987 | Submitted | | |
08/10/1987 | Submission | | |
07/31/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/31/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
07/31/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/25/1987 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/24/1987 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
05/29/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
05/18/1987 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/15/1987 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/17/1987 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/15/1987 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
03/16/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
02/24/1987 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/23/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
01/16/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
01/05/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
01/05/1987 | No Description Available. | | |
01/05/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/23/1986 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/23/1986 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/10/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored |
03/10/2013 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court At Law No 1
Guadalupe
Honorable Fred Moore
CCL-86-1303