judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00314-CR
01-82-00314-CR
05/04/1982
Burglary
Isaacks, Carl Glenn
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/23/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/04/1983No description available.Refused
03/14/1983No description available.
01/27/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/05/1983Submitted
12/13/1982Submission
09/09/1982Brief filed
08/10/1982Brief filed
07/19/1982Record filed
04/23/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
310,363
4 years