judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00344-CR
14-82-00344-CR
05/05/1982
Other Felony
Childress, Leslie Houston
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/02/1983Mandate Issued
03/03/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/13/1983Submission
07/02/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
06/28/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
05/12/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
05/05/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/02/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
327,505
Life