judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-68,981
AP-68,981
05/04/1982
Appeal Case Type
NICHOLS, JOSEPH BERNARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/28/1986SUPP BR FILEDState
02/20/1986BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/04/1985BRIEF FILEDState
10/14/1985BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/07/2007EXECUTED
06/05/1997APPT COUNSEL/ORDERGranted
05/13/1997MOTION FILED
01/13/1989WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
08/11/1988Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
08/11/1988MANDATE ISSD
04/13/1988OPINION ISSDAffirmed
04/13/1988OPINION ISSDAffirmed
06/25/1986Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
06/25/1986SUBMITTED
05/28/1986Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
05/28/1986SET FOR SUBMIS
05/28/1986SUPP BR FILED
02/20/1986BRIEF FILED
12/04/1985BRIEF FILED
10/14/1985BRIEF FILED
05/17/1983SF FILED DP
05/02/1982DP BEGIN
05/02/1982DP BEGIN
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/2010STOREDARCHIVED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nichols, Joseph BernardApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)E. Neil Lane
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable DAN E. WALTON
323836