judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Alvin Valadez, Jr. v. The State of Texas

Case: 04-14-00626-CR
04-14-00626-CR
09/03/2014
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Alvin Valadez, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
04/09/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/03/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/23/2018Fax received
05/26/2016Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk
03/09/2016Mandate issued
03/08/2016Notice received
02/10/2016Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/13/2015Case forwarded to higher court
11/09/2015Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
10/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
09/16/2015Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/08/2015Submitted
07/28/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
04/09/2015Case ready to be set
04/09/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/11/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
03/11/2015Order entered
03/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/06/2015Letter filed
02/03/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
01/27/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
01/27/2015Order entered
01/26/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/26/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
01/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
01/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/29/2014Notice of late brief
11/21/2014Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
10/21/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedFiling is Noted by Court
10/21/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/22/2014Docketing statement filed
09/11/2014Internal memo
09/09/2014Electronic Clerks Record Filed
09/03/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
09/03/2014Case began in court of appeals
08/29/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court
08/26/2014Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/09/2016Case StoredCase stored
03/09/2016Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasChristopher M. Eaton
Valadez, Jr., AlvinCriminal - AppellantEdward F. Shaughnessy, III
Trial Court Information
25th Judicial District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable W.C. Kirkendall
13-1568-CR-C
Phyllis A. Bush
LIFE IMPRISONMENT.