judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00510-CR
05-82-00510-CR
04/22/1982
Manslaughter
Jessie Ernest Jacobs
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/04/1983Brief was not filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/31/1983Order issuedAbated
05/27/1983Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1983Motion to abate appeal filed
05/04/1983Brief was not filed
12/02/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/28/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/03/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/02/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/07/1982Reporters record filed
06/07/1982Clerks record filed
04/22/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Jacobs, Jessie ErnestCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
F81-33499-SN
Life TDC